EP0565860 - Hydraulically-damped rubber mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boge GmbH Bogestrasse 50 D-53783 Eitorf / DE | [1993/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schyboll, Georg Westumer Strasse 69 W-5485 Sinzig-Westum / DE | 02 /
Mayerböck, Wilhelm Felix-Blass-Strasse 2 W-5483 Kirchdaun / DE | [1993/42] | Application number, filing date | 93103823.6 | 10.03.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | DE19924212311 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4212311 | DE19924218110 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4218110 | [1993/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565860 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
F16F13/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Hydraulisch dämpfendes Gummilager | [1993/42] | English: | Hydraulically-damped rubber mount | [1993/42] | French: | Support élastique à amortissement hydraulique | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/38] | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58037337 ; | [A]JP59117929 ; | [X]FR2415241 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0527302 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 120 (M-217)(1265) 25. Mai 1983 & JP-A-58 037 337 ( TOYODA GOSEI KK ) 4. März 1983, & JP58037337 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 238 (M-335)(1675) 31. Oktober 1984 & JP-A-59 117 929 ( TOYODA GOSEI KK ) 7. Juli 1984, & JP59117929 A 00000000 |