EP0562380 - Current transformer for sensing current in an electrical conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beihoff, Bruce Charles 816 N. 66th Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53213 / US | 02 /
Camps, Francis William 2155 S. 78th Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53219 / US | 03 /
Peret, Scot Francis N167 W20930 South Street Jackson, Wisconsin 53037 / US | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewuerzmuehlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103941.6 | 11.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | US19920857854 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: US 857854 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0562380 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0562380 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/02, H01F40/06, H01F27/245 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
H01F27/245 (EP,US);
H01F38/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/39] | G01R15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/39] | Title | German: | Stromtransformator zum Fühlen des Stroms in einem elektrischen Leiter | [1993/39] | English: | Current transformer for sensing current in an electrical conductor | [1993/39] | French: | Transformateur de courant pour détecter le courant dans un conducteur électrique | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/25] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2062476 (RITZ MESSWANDLER GMBH) [X] 1,2,8 * page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 9,10,13,14; | [Y]US4408175 (NELSON MARVIN D [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,13,14 * column 3, line 9 - line 11; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2025150 (MONPLET L) [A] 6,11,15-17,19 * abstract * | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "WANDLER MIT MAGNETISCHEM KERN", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAVANT GB, (198503), no. 251, page 144 [X] 1,2,8 * page 144 * [A] 6,9,11,13-16 |