EP0562389 - Stroke lengthening element for foil keyboards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHURTER GmbH Elsässer Strasse 3 D-79346 Endingen / DE | [1993/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiler, Uwe Goethestrasse 9 W-7831 Wyhl / DE | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Goy, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Zähringer Strasse 373 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104023.2 | 12.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | DE19924209437 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4209437 | [1993/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562389 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70, H01H13/14 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
H01H13/705 (EP);
H01H13/52 (EP);
H01H2237/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/39] | Title | German: | Hubverlängerungselement für Folientastaturen | [1993/39] | English: | Stroke lengthening element for foil keyboards | [1993/39] | French: | Elément d'allongement de la course pour des claviers à touches flexibles | [1993/39] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/05] | 15.09.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3418931 ; | [A]EP0157037 ; | [A]DE2165679 |