EP0615073 - Nut and washer combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abu-plast Kunststoffbetriebe GmbH Am Bahnhof 20 96472 Rödental / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states Abu-Plast Kunststoffbetriebe GmbH Am Bahnhof 20 D-96472 Rödental / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Hilmar, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Höllwiesenweg 7 W-8633 Rödental / DE | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Klose, Hans, et al Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Reble & Klose, Bereich Patente & Marken, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1996/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1994/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104042.2 | 12.03.1993 | [1994/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615073 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615073 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/08, A47K13/26 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
F16B37/08 (EP);
A47K13/26 (EP);
F16B37/16 (EP);
F16B43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | Kombination aus Schraubenmutter und Lochscheibe | [1994/37] | English: | Nut and washer combination | [1994/37] | French: | Combinaison d'écran et rondelle | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1429513 (LESLIE FREELAND D); | [Y]GB744016 (GERALD ROBERT HERMANN MORE); | [A]FR1420955 (FT PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]US3471874 (DIXON FARRIS E); | [A]US3675530 (VICTOR MICHEL N); | [A]US4083288 (WILLIAMS PATRICK YELVERTON); | [AD]DE2723058 (JAEGER HANSWERNER); | [Y]FR2613789 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) |