EP0565891 - Copolymer latex, production and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi, 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shigeo 18-D73-104, Tsukumodai 5-chome, Suita Osaka 565 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Susumu 14-12, Daiwa 1-chome, Takatsuki Osaka 569 / JP | 03 /
Seo, Tomotaka 3-8, Sonehigashimachi 1-chome, Toyonaka Osaka 561 / JP | 04 /
Saruwatari, Takao 50-1, Yamadaminami, Suita Osaka 561 / JP | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/42] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104365.7 | 17.03.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | JP19920062486 | 18.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6248692 | JP19930026807 | 16.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2680793 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565891 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F236/04, C08F2/38 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C08F236/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/04, C08F2/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Copolymerlatex, Herstellung und ihre Verwendung. | [1993/42] | English: | Copolymer latex, production and use thereof | [1993/42] | French: | Latex d'un copolymer, sa préparation et son utilisation | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/11] | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP4041509 ; | [A]JP4041503 ; | [A]FR2249898 | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 9213, 1992 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 92-099883 & JP-A-4 041 509 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND KK) 12 February 1992, & JP4041509 A 19920212 | [A] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 9213, 1992 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 92-099877 & JP-A-4 041 503 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND KK) 12 February 1992, & JP4041503 A 19920212 |