EP0567757 - Cable for datatransfer and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/44] | Cable and method for its manufacture | ||
[1997/17] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG KABEL + SYSTEME CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG KABEL + SYSTEME CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaus, Marco Hellgasse 12 CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | 02 /
Schmucki, Beat Rüttistrasse 7 CH-6467 Schattdorf / CH | 03 /
Aeschlimann, Werner Staldengasse 6 CH-6463 Bürglen / CH | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104385.5 | 17.03.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | DE19924213901 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4213901 | DE19924240209 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4240209 | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0567757 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0567757 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567757 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/02 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
H01B7/1895 (EP);
H01B7/189 (EP);
H01B11/005 (EP);
H01B11/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungskabel und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1997/17] | English: | Cable for datatransfer and method for its manufacture | [1997/17] | French: | Câble pour transmission de donneés et procédé de sa fabrication | [1997/17] |
Former [1993/44] | Kabel und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1993/44] | Cable and method for its manufacture | ||
Former [1993/44] | Câble et procédé de sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 26.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 2 60 D-30002 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | 02
22.01.1998
13.02.1999
WITHDRAWN Leonische Drahtwerke AG Marienstr. 7 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau, Dietrich Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Längenstrasse 14 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 03
23.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 2 60 D-30002 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | ||
02
22.01.1998
13.02.1999
WITHDRAWN Leonische Drahtwerke AG Marienstr. 7 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl, Patentanwälte, Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03
23.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1998/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 2 60 D-30002 Hannover / DE | ||
02
22.01.1998
Leonische Drahtwerke AG Marienstr. 7 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau, Dietrich Tergau & Pohl, Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03
23.01.1998
12.02.1998
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1998/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1998
Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 2 60 D-30002 Hannover / DE | 09.03.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.11.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/11] | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.12.2001 | Appeal received No. T0085/02 | 13.02.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.11.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 17.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE734148 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK) [X] 1,2 * sentence 20 - sentence 96; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 13; | [XA]US2871151 (LIPTON MILTON A) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2,3; | [A]DE3144743 (LAPP KG U I [DE]) [A] 1,2,5* figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | US4835394 |