EP0561394 - Air spring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPW Bergische Achsen Kommanditgesellschaft Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states BPW Bergische Achsen Kommanditgesellschaft Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | ||
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states Bergische Achsenfabrik Fr. Kotz & Söhne Am Ohlerhammer D-51674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adolfs, Manfred In der Bockemühle 47a W-5275 Bergneustadt / DE | 02 /
Leidig, Hans-Josef Wildbergerstrasse 3 W-5226 Reichshof / DE | 03 /
Steiner, Helmut Freiher-vom-Stein-Strasse 1 W-5276 Wiehl / DE | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104398.8 | 18.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | DE19924209039 | 20.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4209039 | [1993/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561394 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561394 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/28, B62D61/12, F16F9/05 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
B60G11/28 (EP);
B62D61/12 (EP);
B60G2200/31 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
B60G2204/128 (EP);
B60G2206/601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/38] | Title | German: | Luftfeder | [1993/38] | English: | Air spring | [1993/38] | French: | Ressort pneumatique | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 18.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1811683U (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE [DE]); | [YD]DE1048165 (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG); | [Y]GB854823 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO); | [A]GB998110 (FREIGHTLINER CORP); | [A]US2917319 (AXTMANN HAROLD G); | [A]FR1350020 ; | [A]US5058916 (HICKS WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]DE3212894 (DAUTEL EMIL GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - GB-A-Q9081 (HOFMANN J.) | Examination | GB191509081 |