EP0561400 - Process for producing rubber-containing graft copolymer particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Koji, c/o Otake Plants Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 02 /
Morimoto, Masaru, c/o Otake Plants Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 03 /
Hirano, Susumu, c/o Otake Plants Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104465.5 | 18.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | JP19920062985 | 19.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6298592 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561400 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561400 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04, C08J3/16 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
C08J3/14 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08J2351/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gummi-enthaltenden Pfropfcopolymerpartikeln | [1993/38] | English: | Process for producing rubber-containing graft copolymer particles | [1993/38] | French: | Procédé pour produire des particules de copolymère greffé contenant un élastomère | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0506036 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [XD]EP0066382 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [XD]FR2445352 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4476266 (MAEDA TETSURO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0418685 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0346853 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |