EP0563754 - Purification device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERTLE FORDERTECHNIK, MATHIAS BERTLE Ressestrasse 1 87459 Pfronten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states BERTLE FORDERTECHNIK, MATHIAS BERTLE Ressestrasse 1 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertle, Mathias Brunnenweg 5 87459 Pfronten / DE | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/40] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104754.2 | 23.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | DE19920004019U | 25.03.1992 Original published format: DE 9204019 U | [1993/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563754 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/09, C10M175/04, B01D17/032, B01D21/00 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
C10M175/04 (EP);
B01D17/00 (EP);
B01D17/0208 (EP);
B01D17/0214 (EP);
B01D17/12 (EP);
B01D21/0012 (EP);
B01D21/02 (EP);
B01D21/24 (EP);
B01D29/09 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1993/40] | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung | [1993/40] | English: | Purification device | [1993/40] | French: | Dispositif de purification | [1993/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4751006 ; | [Y]EP0021811 ; | [A]EP0240027 ; | [A]DE1223806 ; | [A]US4137169 ; | [A]DE3822485 ; | [A]US5030357 |