EP0565911 - Data processing system and method for sequentially repairing character recognition errors for scanned images of document forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Gerald B. 36 Haviland Drive Scarborough, Ontario / CA | 02 /
Betts, Timothy S. 12113 Skip Jack Drive Germantown, MD 20874 / US | 03 /
Carras, Valerie M. 3333 University Bldvd., No. 310 Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 04 /
Knecht, Lewis B. 3801 John Carroll Drive Olney, MD 20832 / US | 05 /
Paulson, Thomas L. 8749 Sleepy Hollow Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/42] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104766.6 | 23.03.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | US19920870129 | 15.04.1992 Original published format: US 870129 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0565911 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0565911 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/03 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G06V30/127 (EP,US);
G06V30/1444 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/42] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem und Verfahren zum sequentiellen Reparieren von Zeichenerkennungsfehlern für abgetastete Formulare | [1993/42] | English: | Data processing system and method for sequentially repairing character recognition errors for scanned images of document forms | [1993/42] | French: | Système et méthode de traitement de données pour réparer séquentiellement des erreurs de reconnaissance de caractères des images balayées de formulaires | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 16.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0312905 (COMPUTER GES KONSTANZ [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0325233 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0425291 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DY] - CASEY R.G., FERGUSON D.R., "Intelligent Forms Processing", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, USA, (1990), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 435 - 450, XP000265375 [DY] 1-10 |