EP0564896 - Feed through for the terminal of accumulator cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gürtler, Josef, Dr. Hovestädter Weg 3 59505 Bad Sassendorf / DE | [1998/02] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states HAGEN BATTERIE AG Coesterweg 45 D-59494 Soest / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gürtler, Josef, Dr. Hovestädter Weg 3 W-4772 Bad Sassendorf 3 / DE | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/41] | Lange, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Nachtigallenweg 8 D-32425 Minden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93104811.0 | 24.03.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | DE19924212214 | 08.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4212214 | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564896 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564896 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/06, H01M2/30 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
H01M50/172 (EP);
H01M50/00 (US);
H01M50/561 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, PT, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Poldurchführung für Akkumulatorenzellen | [1993/41] | English: | Feed through for the terminal of accumulator cells | [1993/41] | French: | Traversée de borne pour cellules d'accumulateurs | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.08.1998 | FR | 05.08.1998 | GB | 05.08.1998 | IT | 05.08.1998 | PT | 05.11.1998 | SE | 05.11.1998 | AT | 24.03.1999 | LU | 24.03.1999 | BE | 31.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/29] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 05.08.1998 | ||
GB | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 24.03.1999 | ||
LU | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 05.08.1998 | ||
GB | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
AT | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
GB | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
AT | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
AT | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 05.11.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 31.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55057259 ; | [A]US1411414 (COOK THOMAS R); | [A]DE1013339 (TRELLEBORGS GUMMIFABRIKS AB); | [X]DE1146149 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE1953414 (SEMPERIT GUMMIWERK GMBH DEUTSC); | [A]DE1596128 (GLOBE UNION INC) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 91 (E-17)(573) 28. Juni 1980 & JP-A-55 057 259 ( FURUKAWA DENCHI K.K. ) 26. April 1980, & JP55057259 A 00000000 |