EP0562626 - Thermal printer head having current sensors connected to heating elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukushima, Itaru, c/o NEC Data Terminals, Ltd. 3-49-1, Kamiishihara Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Nakaba, c/o Susumu Co., Ltd. 14, Umamawashi-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Takashi, c/o Susumu Co., Ltd. 31-2, Dobuchi, Nodai 4-gou Obama-shi, Fukui / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105048.8 | 26.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | JP19920071014 | 27.03.1992 Original published format: JP 7101492 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562626 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562626 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/365, B41J2/37 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/365 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/37 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/3351 (KR);
B41J2/33515 (KR);
B41J2/345 (KR);
B41J2/3553 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/39] | Title | German: | Thermodruckkopf dessen Heizelemente mit Stromsensoren ausgerüstet sind | [1993/39] | English: | Thermal printer head having current sensors connected to heating elements | [1993/39] | French: | Tête d'imprimante dont les éléments chauffants sont reliés à des capteurs de courant | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62116168 ; | [A]JP60244564 ; | [XP]US5132709 (WEST DAVID A [US]); | [Y]EP0320435 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 333 (M-637)30 October 1987 & JP-A-62 116 168 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 27 May 1987, & JP62116168 A 19870527 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 115 (M-474)(2172) 30 April 1986 & JP-A-60 244 564 ( KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK ) 4 December 1985, & JP60244564 A 19851204 |