EP0592762 - Method for seeking the center of a recorded data track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA ASA Kjelsasveien 161 P.O. Box 134, Kjelsas 0411 Oslo / NO | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll 0808 Oslo 8 / NO | ||
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll N-0808 Oslo 8 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jahren, Rolf Bergädveien 29 N-0873 Oslo / NO | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105059.5 | 26.03.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | US19920962320 | 15.10.1992 Original published format: US 962320 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592762 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592762 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/584, G11B5/54, G11B5/55, G11B5/58 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
G11B5/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufsuchen der Mitte einer aufgezeichneten Datenspur | [1994/16] | English: | Method for seeking the center of a recorded data track | [1994/16] | French: | Méthode pour chercher le centre d'une piste de données enregistrées | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.01.1998 | GB | 28.04.1998 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/25] | GB | 28.04.1998 | |
FR | 26.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | FR | 26.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0148999 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0155817 (IRWIN MAGNETIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]EP0387104 (IRWIN MAGNETIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) |