EP0618332 - Guiding and protecting system particularly for the safety of traffic routes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lüft, Peter Morgenstrasse 1 B 55257 Budenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Lüft, Peter Morgenstrasse 1 B D-55257 Budenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Quermann, Helmut Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Quermann, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105314.4 | 31.03.1993 | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618332 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618332 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
E01F15/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | Leitschutzsystem, insbesondere zur Sicherung von Verkehrswegen | [1994/40] | English: | Guiding and protecting system particularly for the safety of traffic routes | [1994/40] | French: | Système de guidage et de protection, en particulier pour protéger la voirie | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 05.06.1996 | IT | 05.06.1996 | SE | 05.09.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | DK | 05.06.1996 | |
IT | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 05.06.1996 | |
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | SE | 05.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1944841U (FRIEDE MARTIN [DE], et al); | [A]DD148071 (PROSENZ PIUS); | [A]FR2598484 (CHADOURNE ROGER [FR], et al); | [Y]EP0352668 (BODENSOHN KARL HEINZ); | [A]DE8814418U ; | [A]FR2642096 (MASAIR [FR]); | [A]EP0385950 (STEINER SILIDUR AG [CH]); | [A]EP0459932 (GARCIA BALLESTEROS ANGEL [ES]) |