EP0569697 - Method for surveillance of overload of a trailer brake of a tractor-trailer combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/46] | Method for controlling overload of a trailer brake of a tractor-trailer combination | ||
[1996/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Standard GmbH Postfach 18 09 53008 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states WABCO STANDARD GmbH Euskirchener Strasse 80, Postfach 18 09 D-53008 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schappler, Hartmut Frobeniusweg 12 W-3000 Hannover 91 / DE | 02 /
Stender, Axel Mittelstrasse 9 W-3257 Springe 2 / DE | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1993/46] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Standard GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105380.5 | 01.04.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | DE19924215341 | 09.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215341 | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569697 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569697 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/66, B60T17/22 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
B60T17/22 (EP,US);
B60T13/66 (EP,US);
B60T7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung der wenigstens einen Anhängerbremse des Anhängers eines Fahrzeugzuges auf Überlast | [1993/46] | English: | Method for surveillance of overload of a trailer brake of a tractor-trailer combination | [1996/04] | French: | Procédé pour contrôle de surcharge d'un frein d'un remorque d'un convoi routier | [1993/46] |
Former [1993/46] | Method for controlling overload of a trailer brake of a tractor-trailer combination | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0188685 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | [A]WO8705571 (SARAMO JORMA); | [AD]EP0320602 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) |