EP0565018 - Packaging container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIESSMANN GmbH & Co Schleizerstrasse 100 95030 Hof / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states VIESSMANN GmbH & Co Schleizerstrasse 100 D-95030 Hof / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viessmann, Hans, Dr. Im Hain W-3559 Battenberg/Eder / DE | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1993/41] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 70 02 45 D-63427 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105588.3 | 05.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | DE19920004795U | 07.04.1992 Original published format: DE 9204795 U | DE19930003808U | 16.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303808 U | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0565018 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0565018 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/02, D21J7/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B65D1/36 (EP);
B65D11/188 (EP);
B65D81/022 (EP);
B65D2565/383 (EP);
Y02W30/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/41] | B65D81/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/41] | Title | German: | Verpackungsbehälter | [1993/41] | English: | Packaging container | [1993/41] | French: | Emballage | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/42] | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.02.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9000732U (VIESSMANN WERKE GMBH & CO.) [X] 1 * page 7, line 5 - line 7; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE9204795U (VIESSMANN WERKE GMBH & CO.) [PX] 1-6; | [DA]US3135450 (CHAPLIN CHARLES J) |