EP0565070 - Electroplating process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states WINTERTHURER METALLVEREDELUNG AG Hegistrasse 39 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states WINTERTHURER METALLVEREDELUNG AG Hegistrasse 39 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müll, Karl Püntstrasse 33 CH-8604 Volketswil-Kindhausen / CH | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1997/31] | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1993/41] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr., et al Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105726.9 | 07.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | DE19924211881 | 09.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211881 | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565070 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565070 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/18 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
C25D5/18 (EP,US);
C25D5/14 (EP,US);
C25D5/605 (EP,US);
C25D5/625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum galvanischen Aufbringen einer Oberflächenbeschichtung | [1993/41] | English: | Electroplating process | [1993/41] | French: | Procédé d'électrodéposition | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59016993 ; | [A]US3318786 (FAUST CHARLES L, et al); | [X]DE1421984 (FORSCH EDELMETALLE UND METALLC); | [X]US4869971 (NEE CHIN-CHENG [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 102 (C-222)(1539) 12. Mai 1984 & JP-A-59 016 993 ( NIHON EREKUTOROPUREITEINGU ENGINEERS K.K ) 28. Januar 1984, & JP59016993 A 00000000 |