EP0566033 - Supporting frame for agricultural harvesting machine, particularly circular mower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik Ges.m.b.H. A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik GmbH A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leposa, Wolfgang Sonnfeldsiedlung 30 A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 02 /
Kagerer, Ingo, Dipl.-Ing. Fabrikstrasse 4 A-4600 Wels / AT | [1997/42] |
Former [1993/42] | 01 /
Leposa, Wolfgang Sonnfeldsiedlung 30 A-4710 Griekskirchen / AT | ||
02 /
Kagerer, Ingo, Dipl.-Ing. Fabrikstrasse 4 A-4600 Wels / AT | Representative(s) | Dupal, Helmut Jägerweg 12 4702 Wallern / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Dupal, Helmut, Dipl-Ing. Jägerweg 12 A-4702 Wallern / AT | Application number, filing date | 93105835.8 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | DE19924212417 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4212417 | [1993/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566033 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566033 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66, A01B59/048 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
A01B59/064 (EP);
A01D34/662 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1993/42] | Title | German: | Tragrahmen mit landwirtschaftlicher Erntemaschine, insbesondere Rotationsmähwerk | [1993/42] | English: | Supporting frame for agricultural harvesting machine, particularly circular mower | [1993/42] | French: | Cadre support pour machine de récolte, en particulier faucheuse rotative | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 27.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.10.1997 | GB | 15.10.1997 | CH | 30.04.1998 | LI | 30.04.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/22] | GB | 15.10.1997 | |
FR | 13.03.1998 | ||
CH | 30.04.1998 | ||
LI | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | GB | 15.10.1997 | |
FR | 13.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | GB | 15.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2086286 (FAHR AG MASCHF); | [A]GB2052237 (KUHN SA); | [AD]DE3322030 (FELLA WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE8701093U ; | [A]EP0382666 (KUHN SA [FR]); | [A]EP0394830 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0400285 (FELLA WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE9016081U ; | [A]DE4007735 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0456900 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) |