EP0576792 - Plasmids and processes for producing recombinant desulphatohirudin HV-1 peptides in Saccharomyces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/01] | Plasmids and process for producing recombinant desulphatohirudin HV-1 peptide | ||
[2002/40] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOGAL GYOGYSZERGYAR RT. Pallagi ut 13 4042 Debrecen / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states BIOGAL GYOGYSZERGYAR RT. Pallagi ut 13 H-4042 Debrecen / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ott, István, Dr. Benczur u. 2 H-1068 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Klupp, Tibor, Dr. Zöldlomb t 19 H-1025 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Molnár, István Kossuth L. u. 32 H-1121 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Patthy, András, Dr. Fenyö u. 10 H-1016 Budapest / HU | 05 /
Barta, István Kassai u. 10 H-1142 Budapest / HU | 06 /
Berk -T th, Zsuzsa, Ir.-Chem. Oceánárok u. 11 H-1046 Budapest / HU | 07 /
Ambrus, Gábor, Dr. Ir.-Chem. Csalán 45/B H-1025 Budapest / HU | 08 /
Salát, János Veresegyházi u. 21 H-1151 Budapest / HU | 09 /
Tegdes, Anik Vizimolnár u. 6 H-1031 Budapest / HU | 10 /
Moravcsik, Imre, Ir.-Chem. Mester u. 38 H-1095 Budapest / HU | 11 /
Együd, Cecilia Rákoczi t 32 H-1072 Budapest / HU | 12 /
Albrecht, Károly Mexik i t 44 H-1145 Budapest / HU | 13 /
Könczöl, Kálmán, Dr. Ir.-Chem. Dunyov I. u. 16 H-1134 Budapest / HU | 14 /
Vincze, Attila Csáktornya park 4 H-1142 Budapest / HU | 15 /
Barabás, Eva, Dr. Pusztaszeri t 6 H-1025 Budapest / HU | 16 /
Máté, György, Ir.-Chem. Eötvös J. u. 15 H-1046 Budapest / HU | 17 /
Botond Kiss, György Dr. Dugonics tér 11 H-6722 Szeged / HU | 18 /
Kiss, Péter Epitö u. 13/a H-6723 Szeged / HU | 19 /
Pölya, Kálmán, Dr. Péchy u. 9 H-4028 Debrecen / HU | 20 /
Erdei, Janos Dr. Andahazi u. 8 H-4032 Debrecen / HU | 21 /
Erdei, Jan s Dr. Hámán K. u. 32 H-4027 Debrecen / HU | 22 /
Zilahi, Erika Urrétje u. 1 H-4032 Debrecen / HU | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 85201 Dachau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 D-85201 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105848.1 | 13.04.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | HU19120000092 | 09.04.1992 Original published format: HU 120092 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0576792 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0576792 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/15, C07K14/815 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/815 (EP,US);
C12N15/76 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | C12N15/15, // C07K14/815 | ||
Former IPC [1994/01] | C12N15/15, // C07K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | Plasmide und Verfahren zur Herstellung von rekombinanten Desulphatohirudin HV-1 Peptiden in Saccharomyces | [2002/40] | English: | Plasmids and processes for producing recombinant desulphatohirudin HV-1 peptides in Saccharomyces | [2002/40] | French: | Plasmides et procédés pour la production de peptides desulphatohirudin HV-1 recombinants dans Saccharomyces | [2002/40] |
Former [1994/01] | Plasmide und Verfahren zur Herstellung von rekombinante Desulphatohirudin HV-1 Peptide | ||
Former [1994/01] | Plasmids and process for producing recombinant desulphatohirudin HV-1 peptide | ||
Former [1994/01] | Plasmides et procédés pour la production des peptides HV-1 de sulphatohirudin recombinants | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9117250 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1 * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0364942 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * claim - *; | [YD]EP0168342 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [YD] 1,2,4,11,12 * page 75 - page 77 *; | [Y]EP0190686 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,11,12 * page 10; table 4 *; | [X]WO9109946 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,13-15 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO8504418 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 15; claim - *; | [DY]EP0340170 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1,2,7-10 * claim - *; | [YD]EP0341215 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1,2,7-10 * claim - *; | [AD]WO8603517 (GEN BIO TEC GES [DE], et al) [AD] * figure 1; examples 2,3 *; | [X] - FURUSAKI, S. ET AL. (EDS.), Biochemical Engineering for 2001, TOKYO, JAPAN, SPRINGER, (19920318) [X] 1 * SATORU MISAWA ET AL.: High level expression and secretion of biologically active leech hirudin variant 1 (HV1) by Escherichia coli, pages 62-64 * | [Y] - DODT, J. ET AL., "Expression, secretion and processing of hirudin in E. coli using the alkaline phosphatase signal sequence", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (198606), vol. 202, no. 2, pages 373 - 377, XP001316574 [Y] 1 * figures 2,5 * * page 376 * | [Y] - JOHNSON, P.H. ET AL., "Biochemistry and genetic engineering of hirudin", SEMINARS IN THROMBOSIS AND HEMOSTASIS, (1989), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 302 - 315 [Y] 1,2,4,11,12 * page 304 - page 305 * * table 1 * | [X] - BERGMANN C. ET AL., "Chemical synthesis and expression of a gene coding for hirudin, the thrombin-specific inhibitor from the leech hirudo medicinalis", BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, (198608), vol. 367, pages 731 - 740 [X] 1,2,5,6,13-16 * see abstract * | [DX] - BENDER, E. ET AL., "Synthesis and secretion of hirudin by Streptomyces lividans", APPLI. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (199011), vol. 34, pages 203 - 207 [DX] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - DODT, J. ET AL., "The complete amino acid sequence of hirudin, a thrombin specific inhibitor", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (198401), vol. 165, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(84)80165-9, pages 180 - 184, XP025592630 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(84)80165-9 |