EP0565113 - High pressure vapor discharge lamp with a built-in igniter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 12-4 Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1993/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Takenobu, c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Works, 1-1, Ichiri-Yamamachi Gyoda-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Shunichi, c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Works, 1-1, Ichiri-Yamamachi Gyoda-shi, Saitama / JP | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/41] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93105860.6 | 08.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | JP19920116685 | 10.04.1992 Original published format: JP 11668592 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565113 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565113 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/56, H01J61/54 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
H01J61/54 (EP,US);
H01J61/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/41] | Title | German: | Hochdruck-Dampf-Entladungslampe mit eingebauter Zündvorrichtung | [1993/41] | English: | High pressure vapor discharge lamp with a built-in igniter | [1993/41] | French: | Lampe à décharge à vapeur haute pression comportant un dispositif d'allumage intégré | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.12.1998 | IT | 23.12.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 23.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60136152 ; | [A]JP03116687 ; | [A]SU1534553 ; | [A]US4987344 (ZASLAVSKY GREGORY [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 295 (E-360)21 November 1985 & JP-A-60 136 152 ( IWASAKI DENKI K.K. ) 19 July 1985, & JP60136152 A 19850719 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 315 (E-1099)12 August 1991 & JP-A-03 116 687 ( IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. ) 17 May 1991, & JP03116687 A 19910517 | [A] - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS Section EI, Week 9045, 19 December 1990 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class X26, AN 90-340890/45 & SU-A-1 534 553 (SULATSKOV) 7 January 1990, & SU1534553 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0550928 | EP0554925 | EP0560441 | EP0562680 |