EP0569739 - Method and apparatus for controlling a pump in a heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG 6301 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Business Support AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marbach, Kuno Widspüelmatte 2 CH-6043 Adligenswil / CH | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106435.6 | 21.04.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | CH19920001511 | 12.05.1992 Original published format: CH 151192 | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569739 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569739 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00, F24D19/10 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
F24D19/0095 (EP);
F24D19/1012 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Umwälzpumpe einer Heizanlage und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1993/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling a pump in a heating system | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour régler une pompe dans une installation de chauffage | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.1997
12.08.1997
WITHDRAWN Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. D-42850 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.1997
12.08.1997
WITHDRAWN Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. D-42850 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | ||
Former [1997/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.03.1997
12.08.1997
WITHDRAWN Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. D-42850 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig c/o Johann Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | 29.04.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.06.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.06.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 09.02.1998 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4004392 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [AD]DE4033163 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) |