EP0568858 - Fluid pressure actuated locking device for a piston, in particular for operating a roll over bar in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states Alfred Teves GmbH & Co. OHG Othestr. 19 D-51702 Bergneustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nowack, Reinhard Germinghauser Weg 3 W-5962 Drolshagen / DE | 02 /
Reuber, Gerhard Lindenstrasse 11 W-5962 Drolshagen / DE | 03 /
Braun, Achim Kalksteinstrasse 16 W-5223 Nümbrecht / DE | 04 /
Roumidis, Dimitrios Vossbicke 1 W-5275 Bergneustadt / DE | 05 /
Seel, Holger, Dipl.-Ing. Goethe-Str. 57 D-71134 Aidlingen / DE | 06 /
Schaible, Kurt Finkenweg 22 D-71134 Aidlingen / DE | [1994/16] |
Former [1993/45] | 01 /
Nowack, Reinhard Germinghauser Weg 3 W-5962 Drolshagen / DE | ||
02 /
Reuber, Gerhard Lindenstrasse 11 W-5962 Drolshagen / DE | |||
03 /
Braun, Achim Kalksteinstrasse 16 W-5223 Nümbrecht / DE | |||
04 /
Roumidis, Dimitrios Vossbicke 1 W-5275 Bergneustadt / DE | Representative(s) | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106438.0 | 21.04.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | DE19924215031 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215031 | [1993/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568858 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568858 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568858 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/26, B60R21/13 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
F15B15/262 (EP);
B60R21/13 (EP);
B60R2021/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/45] | Title | German: | Durch Steuerdruck verriegelbare Kolbenbetätigung, insbesondere für den Transport eines Überrollbügels bei Kraftfahrzeugen | [1993/45] | English: | Fluid pressure actuated locking device for a piston, in particular for operating a roll over bar in a vehicle | [1993/45] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage d'un piston commandé par pression, en particulier pour la commande d'une barre antirenversement d'un véhicule | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3732562 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [YD] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE2143712 (WESTINGHOUSE BREMSEN- U. APPARETEBAU) [Y] 1,3 * page 4, line 6 - page 10, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US2632425 (GROVER) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3586138 (ENGLE) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 11; figures 3-5 *; | [A]DE8505101U (MONTAN-HYDRAULIK) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2128680 (JOHNSTON BROTHERS) [A] 1 |