EP0567124 - Bonding tool having diamond head and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanabe, Keiichiro, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Toshiya, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Ikegaya, Akihiko, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Fujimori, Naoji, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106560.1 | 22.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | JP19920104809 | 23.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10480992 | JP19920104810 | 23.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10481092 | JP19920104811 | 23.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10481192 | JP19920109955 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10995592 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0567124 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0567124 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567124 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/603, H01L21/00, C04B41/50, B23K20/02, C23C16/26 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
B23K20/025 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5002 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L24/79 (EP,US);
H05K13/003 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (US,EP);
C04B41/5002, C04B41/4531, C04B41/5053, C04B41/526 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1993/43] | H01L21/603, H01L21/00, C04B41/50, B23K20/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/43] | Title | German: | Verbindungswerkzeug mit Diamantkopf und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/43] | English: | Bonding tool having diamond head and method of manufacturing the same | [1993/43] | French: | Outil de soudage avec tête en diamant et son procédé de fabrication | [1993/43] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 17.12.1997 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0435423 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]WO9114572 (DIAMONEX INC [US]); | [A]EP0254560 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0032437 (AMERICAN COLDSET CORP [US]); | [X]EP0449571 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]EP0279898 (WINTER & SOHN ERNST [DE]); | [XP]EP0487292 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |