EP0568873 - Beta-aminonitriles and N-alkyl-1,3-propylenediamines as well as their use as fuel and lubricant additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohr, Juergen, Dr. Hochgewanne 48 W-6718 Gruenstadt / DE | 02 /
Oppenlaender, Knut, Dr. Otto-Dill-Strasse 23 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Franz, Lothar, Dr. Pfalzring 198 W-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
Thomas, Juergen, Dr. Merowinger Strasse 5 W-6701 Fussgoenheim / DE | [1993/45] | Application number, filing date | 93106596.5 | 23.04.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | DE19924214810 | 04.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4214810 | [1993/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568873 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568873 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568873 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/24, C07C211/11, C10L1/22, C10M133/54, C08F8/30 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
C10L1/2222 (EP,US);
C07C211/11 (EP,US);
C07C255/24 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/2286 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10L10/06 (EP,US);
C10L10/08 (EP,US);
C10M133/24 (EP,US);
C10M133/54 (EP,US);
C10L1/188 (EP,US);
C10L1/222 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/232 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/2387 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US);
C10M2209/108 (EP,US);
C10M2209/109 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/16 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/45] | C07C255/24, C07C211/11, C10L1/22, C10M133/54 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/45] | Title | German: | Beta-Aminonitrile und N-Alkyl-1,3-propylendiamine sowie deren Verwendung als Kraft- und Schmierstoffadditive | [1996/01] | English: | Beta-aminonitriles and N-alkyl-1,3-propylenediamines as well as their use as fuel and lubricant additives | [1993/45] | French: | Bêta-aminonitriles et N-alkyle-1,3-propylenediamines ainsi que leur utilisation comme additives de combustibles et de lubrifiants | [1993/45] |
Former [1993/45] | Beta-Aminonitrile und N-Alkyl-1,3-propylendiamine sowie deren Verwendung als Kraft- und Schmierstoffaditive | Examination procedure | 30.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 23.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3244491 (MARSH BYRON E, et al) [A] 1,8,10 * column 5, line 53 - line 62; claims 4-10 *; | [A]FR2333853 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * Seite 1, Zeile 7 - Zeile 34; Seite 4, Zeile 11 - Zeile 17; Seite 7, Zeile 12 - Zeile 22; Beispiele D,K, Tabelle I, Ansprüche *; | [AD]DE2245918 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [AD] 4,5,8-10 * example 3; claim - *; | [AD]US3565804 (HONNEN LEWIS R, et al) [AD] 4,5,8-10 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 4; example - *; | [AD]DE3611230 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 4,5,8-10 * examples 3-5; claim - *; | [A]US3189652 (POLLITZER ERNEST L) [A] 4 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 4 *; | [AD]US4332595 (HERBSTMAN SHELDON, et al) [AD] 6,7 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 8 *; | [A]FR1462117 (ARMOUR & CO) [A] 6,7 * page 2, column R, line 7 - line 48 * |