EP0567155 - Wear surveillance device for a sliding caliper disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE PERROT-BREMSE GmbH Bärlochweg 25 W-6800 Mannheim 71 / DE | [1993/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbert, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Ohlystrasse 63a W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Jäger, Hellmut, Dipl.-Ing. Rotkehlchenweg 7 W-6803 Edingen-Neckarhausen 1 / DE | 03 /
Rupprecht, Bernd Büttenweg 13 W-6803 Edingen-Neckarhausen 2 / DE | 04 /
Strauss, Wilfried, Dipl.-Ing. Neckarstrasse 96 W-6948 Wald-Michelbach / DE | 05 /
Antony, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. Osthofener Strasse 52 W-6520 Worms 31 / DE | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/43] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106674.0 | 23.04.1993 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | DE19924213581 | 24.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4213581 | DE19934312377 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4312377 | [1993/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567155 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567155 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
B60T17/22 (EP);
F16D66/026 (EP);
G01B7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/43] | Title | German: | Verschleissüberwachungsvorrichtung für eine Gleitsattel-Scheibenbremse | [1993/43] | English: | Wear surveillance device for a sliding caliper disc brake | [1993/43] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance d'usure pour un frein à disque à étrier glissant | [1993/43] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 16.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0381947 ; | [X]DE3816949 ; | [X]DE3921294 ; | [XP]EP0492143 |