EP0567962 - Syringe pump control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stern, Carl M. 322 Sked Street Pennington, New Jersey 08543 / US | 02 /
Wittes, James M. 41 Pickle Brook Road Bernardsville, New Jersey 07924 / US | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93106716.9 | 26.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | US19920875895 | 29.04.1992 Original published format: US 875895 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567962 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567962 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
A61M5/1456 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14573 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6036 (EP,US);
A61M5/1458 (EP,US);
Y10S128/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/44] | Title | German: | Kontrollsystem für Spritzenpumpe | [1993/44] | English: | Syringe pump control system | [1993/44] | French: | Système de contrôle pour pompe seringue | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE904426 (MARAITE JEAN); | [A]US3858581 (KAMEN DEAN); | [AP]US5176646 (KURODA TAKAYUKI [JP]) |