EP0568036 - Opening machine for containers having a film seal closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/44] | Opening machine for film seal cap | ||
[1996/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KAGAKU BIO-CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. 3-30-1, Shimura Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KAGAKU BIO-CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. 3-30-1, Shimura Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI YUKA BIO-CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. 3-30-1, Shimura Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Naoki, c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Bio-Clinical Laboratories, Inc., 3-30-1, Shimura, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93106889.4 | 28.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | JP19920108237 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10823792 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568036 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568036 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B67B7/82, B67B7/00 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B67B7/00 (EP,US);
B67B7/38 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2185 (EP,US);
Y10T83/219 (EP,US);
Y10T83/293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/44] | Title | German: | Öffnungsvorrichtung für Behälter mit heissverschweissbaren Verschlusseinheiten | [1996/36] | English: | Opening machine for containers having a film seal closure | [1996/36] | French: | Machine d'ouverture de récipients avec opercules thermosoudables | [1996/36] |
Former [1993/44] | Öffnungsvorrichtung für heissverschweissbare Verschlusseinheiten | ||
Former [1993/44] | Opening machine for film seal cap | ||
Former [1993/44] | Machine d'ouverture de capsules thermosoudables | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4187662 (COCHRAN DONALD D [US]); | [Y]US3821850 (KOWALYK R); | [A]FR1358336 (FERRO STAMPING CO); | [A]EP0246900 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US3581605 (TAYLOR JOHN ROBERT); | [A]GB1344424 (OPTREX LTD); | [A]EP0373667 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) |