EP0623759 - Thread forming screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUDWIG HETTICH SCHRAUBENFABRIK GmbH & Co. Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 D-78713 Schramberg-Sulgen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states LUDWIG HETTICH SCHRAUBENFABRIK GmbH & Co. Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 D-78713 Schramberg-Sulgen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettich, Stefan Haldenhof 18 W-7230 Schramberg / DE | 02 /
Hettich, Ulrich Hauptstrasse 11 W-7239 Fluorn-Winzeln / DE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107217.7 | 04.05.1993 | [1994/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623759 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623759 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
F16B25/0026 (EP);
B23G5/06 (EP);
F16B25/00 (EP);
F16B25/0047 (EP);
F16B25/0052 (EP);
F16B25/0073 (EP);
F16B25/0078 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/45] | Title | German: | Gewindeformende Schraube | [1994/45] | English: | Thread forming screw | [1994/45] | French: | Vis autotaraudeuse | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 29.04.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.03.1995 | GR | 01.03.1995 | MC | 01.03.1995 | LU | 31.05.1995 | PT | 01.06.1995 | IE | 04.10.1995 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
MC | 04.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
IE | 04.10.1995 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
MC | 01.03.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
IE | 04.10.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
MC | 01.03.1995 | ||
IE | 31.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
GR | 01.03.1995 | ||
IE | 31.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/38] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
IE | 31.05.1995 | ||
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 01.03.1995 | |
PT | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | PT | 01.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3937119 (ERNST RICHARD JOHN); | [A]US3965793 (ROSER KENNETH L); | [AD]CH651115 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS); | [AD]EP0433484 (HETTICH LUDWIG SCHRAUBENFAB [DE]) |