EP0569833 - Gender test Method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynolds, Rebecca 913 Independence Drive Alameda, California 94501 / US | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Dieter Ernst, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP) 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Wächter, Dieter Ernst, Dr., et al P.O. Box 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 93107259.9 | 05.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | US19920883660 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: US 883660 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569833 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04, C12P19/34 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6879 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1993/46] | Title | German: | Testverfahren zur Bestimmung des Geschlechts | [1993/46] | English: | Gender test Method | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé d'essai de détermination du sexe | [1993/46] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 05.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 01.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/24] | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |