EP0578939 - Device for balancing a grinding disc rotating around an axis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOFMANN MASCHINENBAU GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2 W-6102 Pfungstadt / DE | [1994/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lulay, Eugen Nahestrasse 44 W-6140 Bensheim / DE | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107360.5 | 06.05.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | DE19924222535 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222535 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578939 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578939 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B24B41/04, B23Q11/00, F16F15/22, G01M1/36 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0035 (EP,US);
B24B41/042 (EP,US);
F16F15/28 (EP,US);
G01M1/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Unwuchtausgleich einer um eine Rotationsachse drehbaren Schleifscheibe | [1994/03] | English: | Device for balancing a grinding disc rotating around an axis | [1994/03] | French: | Dispositif pour équilibrer une meule en rotation autour d'un axe | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3827193 (LIEBMANN W, et al); | [A]EP0044825 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [X]EP0409462 (WRIGHT BARRY CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0409050 (BALANCE SYSTEMS SRL [IT]); | [A]EP0460282 (NORITAKE CO LTD [JP]) |