EP0569851 - Pipetting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Postfach 11 49 35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Behring Diagnostics GmbH Postfach 11 49 35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kressirer, Rudolf Breslauer Strasse 39 W-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/46] |
Former [1993/46] | Kachholz, Traudel, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107364.7 | 06.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | DE19924216128 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4216128 | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569851 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569851 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, G01N35/10 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
G01N35/10 (EP,US);
B01F31/445 (EP,US);
B01L3/021 (EP,US);
B01F2101/23 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00425 (EP,US);
G01N2035/1058 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/46] | B01L3/02, G01N35/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Pipettiervorrichtung | [1993/46] | English: | Pipetting device | [1993/46] | French: | Dispositif de pipettage | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62179380 ; | [A]EP0316698 (GUIGAN JEAN); | [A]EP0463468 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]DE9111441U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 28 (C-471)27. Januar 1988 & JP-A-62 179 380 ( SUMITOMO ) 6. August 1987, & JP62179380 A 00000000 |