EP0569883 - Circuit arrangement for limiting the current at make in an electronic componentry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Paula-Modersohn-Strasse 8 W-7500 Karlsruhe 41 / DE | [1993/46] | Application number, filing date | 93107472.8 | 07.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | DE19924215676 | 13.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215676 | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569883 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0569883 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H02M3/335, G05F3/16 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
H02H9/001 (EP);
H03K17/163 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/46] | H02H9/02, H02M3/335, H01C7/13, G05F3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/46] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Begrenzung des Einschaltstroms in einer elektronischen Baugruppe | [1993/46] | English: | Circuit arrangement for limiting the current at make in an electronic componentry | [1993/46] | French: | Constitution des circuits pour limitation du courant lors de la fermeture du circuit à ensemble électronique | [1993/46] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/06] | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.07.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4013731 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [Y] 1,2; | [Y]DE3813536 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [Y] 1,2; | [A]EP0356186 (STC PLC) [A] 1,2; | [A]DE3535864 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,2 |