EP0569884 - Rust inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1839-3, Izumi-cho Tokorozawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states UNION CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1839-3, Izumi-cho Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otomo, Shigeru 531-32, Kounoyama Abiko-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107478.5 | 07.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | JP19920148837 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: JP 14883792 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569884 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569884 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/12, C23F11/14, C23F11/16 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
C23F11/149 (EP,US);
C23F11/124 (EP,US);
C23F11/16 (EP,US);
C23F11/163 (EP,US);
C23F11/164 (EP,US);
C23F11/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/46] | Title | German: | Rostschutzmittel | [1993/46] | English: | Rust inhibitor | [1993/46] | French: | Inhibiteur de la rouille | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4244054 ; | [A]JP59133377 ; | [X]US4278791 (BOTTA ARTUR, et al); | [A]DE3330223 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]US2583399 (AARON WACHTER, et al); | [A]US3843337 (KORPICS C) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 92-337740 & JP-A-4 244 054 (NEOS) 1 September 1992, & JP4244054 A 19920901 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 255 (C-253)(1692) 21 November 1984 & JP-A-59 133 377 ( KATAYAMA ) 31 July 1984, & JP59133377 A 19840731 |