EP0569941 - A process for the production of meat broth and meat extract [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stute, Rolf, Dr. In den Gänsäckern 6 D-71686 Remseck / DE | 02 /
Seuss, Ingrid, Dr. Liedeweg 55a D-36093 Künzell / DE | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/46] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107658.2 | 11.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | DE19924216078 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4216078 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0569941 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0569941 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569941 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/313, A23L1/231 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
A23L13/30 (EP);
A45C13/30 (KR);
A23L27/23 (EP);
A23L27/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/46] | A23L1/313 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fleischbrühe und Fleischextrakt | [1993/46] | English: | A process for the production of meat broth and meat extract | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé pour la production de bouillon et d'extrait de viande | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0064104 (AMRAF LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 1 - line 7; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0244157 (ATTECK LOUIS AUGUSTUS GEORGE) [X] 1-8* claim 1 * | [A] - SCHORMÜLLER J., lehrbuch der lebensmittelchemie, BERLIN-HEIDERBERG-NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1974) [A] 1-10 * page 327, paragraph 3 - page 328, line 20 * |