EP0591613 - Protective device for a medical radiation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states Heraeus Kulzer GmbH Heraeusstr. 12 - 14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtz, Herwig, Dr. Hardtwaldallee 8 W-6382 Friedrichsdorf 3 / DE | 02 /
Fritze, Joachim, Dr. Gartenstrasse 21 W-6382 Friedrichsdorf 3 / DE | [1994/15] | Application number, filing date | 93107768.9 | 13.05.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | DE19924233870 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233870 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591613 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12, A61B17/22, A61B19/08, A61C19/00, A61C1/16 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
B29C35/08 (EP);
A61B46/10 (EP);
A61C1/16 (EP);
A61C19/004 (EP);
B29C2035/0827 (EP);
B29C2035/0833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/15] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für ein medizinisches Bestrahlungsgerät | [1994/15] | English: | Protective device for a medical radiation apparatus | [1994/15] | French: | Dispositif de protection d'un appareil de radiation médical | [1994/15] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 01.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8809192 (SEDLBAUER) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1,2,4,8 *; | [Y]FR2260746 (NATH) [Y] 1-13 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]US5122904 (FUJIWARA) [A] 12,13 * column 3, line 45 - line 54 *; | [A]US4385812 (WILLE ET AL.) |