EP0570873 - Non-linear video signal processor employing picture element analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lagoni, William Adamson 4704 West 81st Place Indianapolis, Indiana / US | 02 /
Pica, Albert Paul 2 Poplar Run East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | 03 /
Bergen, James Russell 57 East Prospect Street Hopewell, New Jersey / US | 04 /
Christopher, Todd J. 1402 S. Kitley Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana / US | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Postfach 61 04 34 30604 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Postfach 91 13 45 D-30433 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93107943.8 | 15.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | US19920887453 | 22.05.1992 Original published format: US 887453 | [1993/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0570873 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0570873 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570873 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/20 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
H04N5/20 (EP,US);
H04N5/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, PT [1993/47] | Title | German: | Nichtlineare Video-Signalprozessor unter Verwendung von Bildelementanalyse | [1993/47] | English: | Non-linear video signal processor employing picture element analysis | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif de traitement non-linéaire de signaux vidéo utilisant une analyse des éléments de l'image | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0019518 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 14 - line 34 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 8 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 12 * [Y] 3; | [PX]EP0488542 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [YA]US4353092 (BAILEY PETER K, et al) [Y] 3 * column A; figure 2 * [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0083865 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-3,5 * page 8, line 5 - page 13, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0459366 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * |