EP0571985 - Positive fixation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 North Hamline Avenue St. Paul Minnesota 55112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heil, Ronald W., Jr. 2312 Western Avenue North Roseville Minnesota 55113 / US | 02 /
Wickham, Robert W., Jr. Deceased / US | 03 /
Kenknight, Bruce H. 3319 Parkview Robbinsdale, Minnesota 55112 / US | [1994/28] |
Former [1993/48] | 01 /
Heil, Ronald W., Jr. 1148 W. Eldridge Avenue Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | ||
02 /
Wickham, Robert W., Jr. Route 2, Box 5Z Harris, Minnesota 55032 / US | |||
03 /
Kenknight, Bruce H. 3319 Parkview Robbinsdale, Minnesota 55112 / US | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/48] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108518.7 | 26.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | US19920888492 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: US 888492 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0571985 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0571985 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571985 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/0573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur positiven Befestigung | [1993/48] | English: | Positive fixation device | [1993/48] | French: | Dispositif de fixation positive | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.1999 | BE | 15.12.1999 | CH | 15.12.1999 | ES | 15.12.1999 | GR | 15.12.1999 | IT | 15.12.1999 | LI | 15.12.1999 | NL | 15.12.1999 | SE | 15.12.1999 | DK | 15.03.2000 | PT | 15.03.2000 | IE | 26.05.2000 | LU | 26.05.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
GR | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
LU | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
GR | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
DK | 15.03.2000 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
MC | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
NL | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
ES | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
IE | 26.05.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
CH | 15.12.1999 | ||
LI | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 20.03.2000 | ||
LI | 20.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 15.12.1999 | |
PT | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 20.03.2000 | ||
LI | 20.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 15.12.1999 | |
PT | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2187365 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5,8,18,19,23 * page 3, line 18 - page 6, line 39; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4011875 (LEHR SIEGFRIED R, et al); | [XA]DE2736275 (KOGLEK WALTER) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 32; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,8,23; | [A]DE2931643 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG) | by applicant | US3814104 | US4013690 | US4058128 | US4142530 | US4233992 | US4357946 | US4378023 | US4624265 | US4649938 | US4858623 | US4860760 |