EP0573854 - Color photographic materials and methods with stabilized silver chloride emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lok, Roger c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Hendricks III, Jess Byrd c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108587.2 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | US19920890884 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: US 890884 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573854 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573854 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C1/34 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
G03C7/3022 (EP,US);
G03C1/346 (EP,US);
G03C7/39236 (EP,US);
Y10S430/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] |
Former [1993/50] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Farbphotographische Materialien und Verfahren mit stabilisierten Silberchloridemulsionen | [1993/50] | English: | Color photographic materials and methods with stabilized silver chloride emulsions | [1993/50] | French: | Matériaux photographiques couleur et procédés avec émulsions au chlorure d'argent stabilisées | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2385762 (MUELLER FRITZ W H); | [AD]EP0325235 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |