EP0572019 - Method of operating a data processing facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [1996/33] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE | ||
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GmbH Emmentaler Strasse 132-150 D-13409 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günther, Stephan Forstweg 63 a W-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | [1998/33] |
Former [1993/48] | 01 /
Günther, Stephan Forstweg 63 a W-1000 Belin 28 / DE | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/48] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108608.6 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | DE19924217830 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4217830 | [1993/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0572019 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0572019 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572019 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
G06F11/1435 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/08] |
Former [1993/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Datenverarbeitungsanlage | [1993/48] | English: | Method of operating a data processing facility | [1993/48] | French: | Procédé d'activation d'installation de traitement de données | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8402409 (SEQUOIA SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 5 - line 25 *; | [A]EP0249061 (IBM [US]) [A] 6-10 * abstract * | [A] - A. J. SUTTON, "Tracking register", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198407), vol. 27, no. 2, page 976 [A] 1-10 |