EP0573020 - Method of manufacturing molded glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS Co., Ltd. Harigaya 4-7-25 Urawa-shi Saitama 338 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS Co., Ltd. Harigaya 4-7-25 Urawa-shi, Saitama 338 / JP | |||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS Co., Ltd. Harigaya 4-7-25 Urawa-shi, Saitama 338 / JP | |||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS Co., Ltd. Harigaya 4-7-25 Urawa-shi, Saitama 338 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonemoto, Tadayoshi Yagumokita-machi 2-107 Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Yoshiyuki Narita-cho 6-7-302 Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Takashi Higashi Nakaburi 1-16-8-615 Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 04 /
Muroi, Toshihiko Oaza Aikawa Azaidaira 590, Shimogou-cho Minami Aizu-gun, Fukushima 969-53 / JP | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108886.8 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | JP19920143927 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14392792 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573020 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573020 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C03B19/02, C03B7/12, C03B11/08 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C03B11/08 (EP,US);
C03B11/084 (EP,US);
C03B11/086 (EP,US);
C03B19/02 (EP,US);
C03B7/12 (EP,US);
C03B2215/06 (EP,US);
C03B2215/07 (EP,US);
C03B2215/11 (EP,US);
C03B2215/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Glasgegenständen | [1993/49] | English: | Method of manufacturing molded glass | [1993/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'objets en verre moulé | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3271126 (JENKINS WESTON H); | [X]US3293017 (JENKINS WESTON H); | [Y]DE3924238 (HOYA CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0378292 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0305792 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al); | [A]EP0408065 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US3961927 (ALDERSON JOHN VICTOR, et al); | [A]GB766854 (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | [A]EP0250091 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]EP0191618 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0146315 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4721518 (MONJI HIDETO [JP], et al); | [A]US3833347 (ANGLE M, et al) |