EP0574775 - Reactive, water-emulsifiable binders and their use in the preparation of lacquers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | [1993/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kressdorf, Burkhard, Dr. Ellinghäuser Strasse 15 W-3030 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
Dannhorn, Wolfgang, Dr. Meisenweg 1 W-3032 Fallingbostel / DE | 03 /
Lühmann, Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. Kastanienweg 2 W-3036 Bomlitz 1 / DE | 04 /
Hoppe, Lutz, Dr. Am Badeteich 8 W-3030 Walsrode / DE | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, et al c/o Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Hellfeldt, Kurt, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1993/51] | Braun, Rolf, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93108997.3 | 04.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | DE19924219767 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: DE 4219767 | [1993/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574775 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574775 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C09D175/14, C08G18/67 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | Reaktive, wasseremulgierbare Bindemittel und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Lacken | [1993/51] | English: | Reactive, water-emulsifiable binders and their use in the preparation of lacquers | [1993/51] | French: | Liants réactifs émulsifiables dans l'eau et leur utilisation pour la préparation de lacques | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0084312 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US4760111 (AMBROSE RONALD R [US], et al); | [X]EP0356848 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0451590 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) |