EP0573911 - Method for depositing silicon oxide films of improved properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 58039 M/S 0934 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95052-8039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. P.O. Box 58039, M/S 0934, 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95052-8039 / US | ||
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. P.O. Box 58039 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara California 95052-8039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Bang 4456 Bush Circle Fremont, California 94538 / US | 02 /
Yieh, Ellie 12 Shamrock Court Millbrae, California 94030 / US | 03 /
Galiano, Maria 1516 Ambergrove Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109008.8 | 04.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | US19920896296 | 10.06.1992 Original published format: US 896296 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573911 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573911 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573911 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/314, H01L21/316 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
C23C16/402 (EP,US);
H01L21/31 (KR);
H01L21/02164 (EP,US);
C23C16/452 (EP,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,US);
H01L21/3144 (US);
H01L21/31612 (US);
H01L21/0217 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auftragen von Silizium-Oxid-Schichten mit verbesserten Eigenschaften | [1993/50] | English: | Method for depositing silicon oxide films of improved properties | [1993/50] | French: | Procédé de dépôt de couches d'oxyde de silicium à caractéristiques améliorées | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4510172 (RAY ASIT K [US]); | [A]US4956312 (VAN LAARHOVEN JOSEPHUS M F G [NL]); | [A]US5040046 (CHHABRA NAVJOT [US], et al); | [X]DE4118165 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,11,12,14-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5120680 (FOO PANG-DOW [US], et al); | [A] - K.FUJINO, "dependence of deposition rate on base materials", PROCEEDINGS 7-TH INTERN. IEEE VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE, SANTA CLARA,CA, (19900612), doi:doi:10.1109/VMIC.1990.127864, pages 187 - 193, XP002141271 [A] 1,10,11,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VMIC.1990.127864 |