EP0628390 - Proportioning and conveyer pump and employment of such a pump for making moulded resin bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICAFIL Vakuumtechnik AG Badenerstrasse 780 CH-8048 Zürich / CH | [1994/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gmeiner, Paul Lettenstrasse 309 CH-8966 Lieli / CH | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Kaiser, Helmut, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht - TEI Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Kaiser, Helmut, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht - TEI Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1997/10] | Kaiser, Helmut, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG, Intellectual Property Department (TEI), Bldg.699/1st Floor, P.O. Box 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1994/50] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr., et al Asea Brown Boveri AG, Abt. TEI - Immaterialgüterrecht, Wiesenstrasse 26 CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 93109160.7 | 08.06.1993 | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628390 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628390 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/60 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
B29B7/603 (EP);
B01F35/7174 (EP);
B01F35/8822 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/50] | Title | German: | Dosier- und Förderpumpe und Verwendung einer solchen Pumpe in einer Anlage zur Herstellung eines Giessharzkörpers | [1994/50] | English: | Proportioning and conveyer pump and employment of such a pump for making moulded resin bodies | [1994/50] | French: | Pompe de dosage et de transport et utilisation d'une telle pompe dans une installation pour la fabrication de corps moulés en résine | [1997/17] |
Former [1994/50] | Pompe de dosage et de transport et utilisation d'une telle pompe dans une installation pour la fabrication de corps moulés de résin | Examination procedure | 08.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Wilhelm Hedrich Vakuumanlagen GmbH & Co. KG Greifenthaler Strasse 28 35630 Ehringshausen-Katzenfurt / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Eckhard Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [1998/12] | 04.03.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/15] | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 23.04.1997 | |
LI | 23.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2705223 (ACCURATIO SYSTEMS); | [X]EP0330032 (OMS IMPIANTI SPA [IT]); | [A]GB1305630 ; | [A]EP0133292 (SCHWERDTEL LUDWIG GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0421378 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK [JP]); | [A]FR2565158 (HEDRICH VAKUUMANLAGEN WILHELM [DE]); | [A]US4286732 (JAMES JAMES R, et al); | [A]FR2399008 (SPUEHL AG [CH]) |