EP0573963 - Keyboard instrument for selectively producing mechanical sounds and synthetic sounds without any mechanical vibrations on music wires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Kiyoshi c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Koseki, Shinya c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Nobuo c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Wada, Masahiro c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr., Dipl.-Phys. Wagner & Geyer Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109211.8 | 08.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | JP19920174813 | 09.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17481392 | JP19920207352 | 10.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20735292 | JP19920299234 | 12.10.1992 Original published format: JP 29923492 | JP19930031420 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: JP 3142093 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573963 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573963 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573963 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G10C5/00 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
G10H1/0066 (EP,US);
G10C5/10 (EP,US);
G10H1/344 (EP,US);
G10H1/346 (EP,US);
G10H2230/011 (EP,US);
G10H2240/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/50] | Title | German: | Tastaturinstrument zur selektiven Erzeugung von mechanischem Schall und synthetischem Schall ohne mechanische Vibrationen von Saiten | [1998/36] | English: | Keyboard instrument for selectively producing mechanical sounds and synthetic sounds without any mechanical vibrations on music wires | [1993/50] | French: | Instrument à clavier pour générer sélectivement ses sons mécaniques et synthétiques sans vibrations mécaniques des cordes | [1993/50] |
Former [1993/50] | Tastaturinstrument zur selektiven Erregung von mechanischen und synthetischen Schall ohne mechanischen Vibrationen von Saiten | Examination procedure | 04.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02022642.9 / EP1280131 | EP02022643.7 / EP1278180 | EP06004732.1 / EP1667105 | EP98124274.6 / EP0918316 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE68406 (O.THEIN); | [A]US2250065 (KOCHL JAMES A) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 32 - line 54; figure 2 *; | [A]CH614303 (VON ALLMEN MARTIN [CH]); | [A]US4704931 (NAGAI YOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - line 65 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 8 *; | [XA]DE3707591 (SEILER ED PIANOFORTEFAB GMBH) [X] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 18 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 9 * [A] 2,3,7 |