EP0575813 - Multilayer glass ceramic substrate and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikuina, Kazuhiro c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Yuzo c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109215.9 | 08.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920147029 | 08.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14702992 | JP19920147030 | 08.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14703092 | JP19920147031 | 08.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14703192 | JP19920159070 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15907092 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0575813 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0575813 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575813 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/00, C03C14/00, H01L23/15, H05K1/03 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C03C17/361 (EP,US);
C03C14/004 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3639 (EP,US);
C03C17/3642 (EP,US);
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/52] | C03C10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/52] | Title | German: | Glaskeramisches Mehrschichtsubstrat und Verfahren zur seiner Herstellung | [1996/52] | English: | Multilayer glass ceramic substrate and process for producing the same | [1993/52] | French: | Substrat vitrocéramique à multi-couche et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/52] |
Former [1993/52] | Gestapeltes glaskeramisches Mehrschichtsubstrat und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE4307600 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0360443 ; | JPH02225339 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]EP0396155 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 17, Database accession no. 91-121370, & JPH0360443 A 19910315 (KYOCERA CORP.) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910506), vol. 114, no. 18, Database accession no. 169815, page 346 [X] 1-7 * abstract * |