EP0575882 - Organic optical material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO SEIHINKAIHATSU KENKYUSHO 82-1, Kitaakitsu, Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | [1993/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taira, Tetsusaburo 82-1, Kitaakitsu, Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ikari, Makoto 82-1, Kitaakitsu, Tokorozawa-shi Saitama / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109613.5 | 16.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920202849 | 22.06.1992 Original published format: JP 20284992 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0575882 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0575882 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575882 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/44, G02B1/04 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | Organisches optisches Material | [1993/52] | English: | Organic optical material | [1993/52] | French: | Matériau optique organique | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3639035 (IRIE MASANORI) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0133779 (RUBBER & PLASTIC RES ASS [GB]) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1-36 *; | [Y]EP0454462 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0273626 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]GB1081319 (LUBRIZOL CORP) [A] 1 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0131948 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 * |