EP0574926 - Process and apparatus for producing silicon nitride ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuzuki, Yasushi, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Yamagata, Shin-ichi, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Yamakawa, Akira, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109718.2 | 17.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | JP19920184416 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: JP 18441692 | JP19920184417 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: JP 18441792 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0574926 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0574926 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574926 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58, C04B35/64, C04B35/584, C04B35/645 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
F27B5/04 (EP,US);
C04B35/5935 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
F27B21/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/51] | C04B35/58, C04B35/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Siliciumnitridkeramik | [1993/51] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing silicon nitride ceramic | [1993/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de céramique en nitrure de silicium | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.11.1997 | SE | 19.02.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/35] | SE | 19.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JPS301270B ; | [DA]JPS5247015 ; | [A]EP0079678 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 3,4,10,11 * figure 3; claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]EP0081195 (CERAVER [FR]) [A] 1,2,7,8,14-17 * example 2; claims 4-6 *; | [YA]EP0225087 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * page 3, line 31 - line 37; claims 1-3 * [A] 14-17; | [YA]DE3825955 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 51 * * page 4, line 1 - line 10 * * page 5, line 57 - line 60 * * page 16, line 1 - line 11; example 5 * * claim 7 * [A] 3-5 | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 21, Database accession no. 77-37137Y, & JPS5247015 A 19770414 (NA INST RE INORG MA) [DA] * abstract * |