EP0585552 - Use of complement inhibitors for preparing a medicament for the prophylaxis and treatment of inflammatory intestinal and skin diseases as well as purpura [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Behring Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Aventis Behring Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Centeon Pharma GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Römisch, Jürgen Sonnenhang 13 D-3550 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Paques, Eric-Paul Auf der Kanzel 4 D-3550 Marburg / DE | 03 /
Bartlett, Robert Schmittweg 23 D-6100 Darmstadt-Arheiligen / DE | 04 /
Dickneite, Gerhard Zum Neuen Hieb 31 D-3550 Marburg / DE | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/45] |
Former [2000/44] | Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr., et al Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109742.2 | 18.06.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | DE19924222534 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222534 | [1994/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585552 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585552 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, A61K38/00, A61K38/46 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/4873 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | C07K15/00, A61K37/02, A61K37/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Komplement-Inhibitoren zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Prophylaxe und Therapie von entzündlichen Darm- und Hauterkrankungen sowie Purpura | [1994/10] | English: | Use of complement inhibitors for preparing a medicament for the prophylaxis and treatment of inflammatory intestinal and skin diseases as well as purpura | [1994/10] | French: | Emploi des inhibiteurs du complément pour la préparation de médicaments pour la prophylaxe et le traitement des maladies inflammatoires intestinales et de la peau et de la Purpura | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2002 | Decision despatched | 12.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.10.2000 | Decision despatched | 12.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 08.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.01.2003 | DK | 29.04.2003 | PT | 29.04.2003 | SE | 29.04.2003 | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/46] | GR | 29.01.2003 | |
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | PT | 29.04.2003 | |
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 29.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2617202 (TROPONWERKE DINKLAGE & CO); | [AD]EP0222611 (SANKYO CO [JP]); | [X]WO9210205 (T CELL SCIENCES INC [US]); | [XP]US5135916 (SIMS PETER J [US], et al) |