EP0575907 - A system for the reception and transmission of information between fixed and mobile stations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI MANUFACTURING S.p.A. Via Griziotti, 4 20145 Milano / IT | [1997/20] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI RETE S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti I-20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cacciotti, Angelo Via di Sant'Erasmo 23 I-00184 Roma / IT | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93109767.9 | 18.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | IT1992RM00490 | 26.06.1992 Original published format: IT RM920490 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575907 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G08G1/096716 (EP);
G08G1/096758 (EP);
G08G1/096783 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1993/52] | Title | German: | System zum Empfangen und Senden von Nachrichten zwischen ortsfesten und beweglichen Stationen | [1993/52] | English: | A system for the reception and transmission of information between fixed and mobile stations | [1993/52] | French: | Système pour la réception et la transmission d'informations entre stations fixes et mobiles | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3105119 (CORY JR CARLETON D, et al); | [Y]US3899671 (STOVER HARRIS A); | [Y]DE2615797 (VDO SCHINDLING); | [Y]DE3536820 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3824541 (OVERBECK FELIX JOHANNES DIPL I [DE]); | [Y]FR2670018 (CHEVALIER JEAN PIERRE) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 29, no. 1, June 1986, NEW YORK US pages 385 - 387 'TRANSPORTATION INFORMATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM' |