EP0617250 - A method of producing a refrigerant tube for heat exchangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/39] | Refrigerant tubes for heat exchangers | ||
[1998/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM CORPORATION 224, 6-cho Kaizan-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8576 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM CORPORATION 224, 6-cho Kaizan-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Hirosaburo 10-7, Shukugo 2-chome Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yuji 2454-7, Awamiya Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | 03 /
Ito, Shinji 264-4, Oaza-Doto Oyama-shi, Tochigi / JP | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109803.2 | 18.06.1993 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | JP19930068578 | 26.03.1993 Original published format: JP 6857893 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0617250 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0617250 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617250 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/02, B21C37/15, F28D1/03, B21H7/18 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
F28F3/048 (EP,US);
F28F1/022 (EP,KR,US);
B21B1/227 (EP,US);
B21C37/121 (KR);
B21C37/151 (EP,US);
B21H8/00 (EP,US);
F28D1/0316 (EP,US);
F28D1/0391 (EP,US);
F28F3/04 (EP,US);
F28F21/084 (KR);
F28F2225/04 (EP,US);
Y10S165/464 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49377 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49378 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49384 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49391 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/39] | F28F1/02, B21C37/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Kühlrohrs für Wärmetauscher | [1998/23] | English: | A method of producing a refrigerant tube for heat exchangers | [1998/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un tube de refroidissement pour échangeurs de chaleur | [1999/12] |
Former [1994/39] | Kühlrohre für Wärmetauscher | ||
Former [1994/39] | Refrigerant tubes for heat exchangers | ||
Former [1994/39] | Tubes de refroidissement pour échangeurs de chaleur | Examination procedure | 21.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98101949.0 / EP0845646 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1468710 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [Y] 11,12 * page 2, line 39 - line 75; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,14-17; | [X]US4313327 (O'CONNOR JOSEPH M) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XA]DE3730117 (NORSK HYDRO AS) [X] 1 * figures 1A-3B; claim 1 *[A] 11; | [XA]GB2256471 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 19, line 12 - page 21, line 11; figures 14-19 * [A] 11,14-17; | [XAY]US5172476 (JOSHI SHRIKANT M [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 41; figures 1-6 * [A] 14-17 [Y] 11,12 |